AL SB307 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health, require health care facilities to allow one caregiver or visitor to patients or residents, subject to reasonable restrictions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health, require health care facilities to allow one caregiver or visitor to patients or residents, subject to reasonable restrictions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 916 (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateIndefinitely Postponed
2021-04-13SenateHealthcare first Amendment Offered
2021-04-13SenateGudger motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2021-04-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2021-03-18SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2021-03-04SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare

Same As/Similar To

HB521 (Same As) 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 4:44 p.m. on May 4, 2021.

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback