AL HB51 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Taxation, sales tax exemptions, sales and use tax exemption provided for purchases of hearing instruments, including hearing aids.
Title
Taxation, sales tax exemptions, sales and use tax exemption provided for purchases of hearing instruments, including hearing aids.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 1192 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 1191 NWB5J8T-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change TVMX591-1 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change Tabled (Y: 35 N: 48 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change Tabled TVMX591-1 (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 1191 NWB5J8T-1 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change TVMX591-1 (Y: 95 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change Tabled (Y: 35 N: 48 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-02-29 - House - Instrument Change Tabled TVMX591-1 (Y: 67 N: 17 NV: 14 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-16 | House | Enacted |
2024-05-09 | House | Enrolled |
2024-05-09 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-05-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-09 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1192 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1191 NWB5J8T-1 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment Offered NWB5J8T-1 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Finance and Taxation Education 1st Amendment NWB5J8T-1 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2024-02-29 | House | Engrossed |
2024-02-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 160 |
2024-02-29 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 159 TVMX591-1 |
2024-02-29 | House | Wilcox motion to Table - Lost Roll Call 158 |
2024-02-29 | House | Wilcox motion to Table - Adopted Roll Call 156 TVMX591-1 |
2024-02-29 | House | W&ME Reported Substitute Offered from House Ways and Means Education TVMX591-1 |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted TVMX591-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Committee Amendment Adopted D5FDNNN-1 |
2024-02-28 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-28 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Ways and Means Education |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education |
2024-01-12 | House | Prefiled |