AL HB509 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Monroe Co., county revenue commissioner, salary
Title
Monroe Co., county revenue commissioner, salary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 748 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 747 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 414 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 413 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 747 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 414 (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 74 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Shiver motion to Adopt Roll Call 413 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 50 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:01 p.m. on April 6, 2021. |
2021-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-198. |
2021-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 748 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 414 |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 11 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |