AL HB485 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Artificial intelligence, limit the use of facial recognition, to ensure artificial intelligence is not the only basis for arrest
Title
Artificial intelligence, limit the use of facial recognition, to ensure artificial intelligence is not the only basis for arrest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-03-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB465 (Same As) 2021-02-25 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary