AL HB453 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supplemental appropriations from State General Fund to specified agencies, supp. approp. for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2021.
Title
Supplemental appropriations from State General Fund to specified agencies, supp. approp. for fiscal year ending Sept. 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1206 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1205 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1204 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1203 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1103 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 307 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 306 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 305 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1205 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1204 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Albritton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1203 (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1103 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 307 (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 306 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - HBIR: Clouse motion to Adopt Roll Call 305 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:25 p.m. on May 4, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-443. |
2021-05-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Clouse motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1103 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1206 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1205 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Albritton Amendment Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Albritton motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1204 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Finance and Taxation General Fund first Substitute Offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 307 |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 306 |
2021-03-09 | House | Clouse Amendment Offered |
2021-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |