AL HB444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health with 1 amendment
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnant women, umbilical cord blood, education regarding the potential benefits of donations, storage, and use, Umbilical Cord Blood Use Act
Title
Pregnant women, umbilical cord blood, education regarding the potential benefits of donations, storage, and use, Umbilical Cord Blood Use Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gerald Allen [R] | Rep. Harry Bridges [R] | Rep. Todd Greeson [R] | Rep. Joseph Hubbard [D] |
Rep. Jay Love [R] | Rep. Mary McClurkin [R] | Rep. Mike Millican [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Health with 1 amendment | |
2010-04-21 | Health first Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health | |
2010-03-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 472 | |
2010-03-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-26 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |