AL HB42 | 2015 | 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax withholding exemption repealed, Revenue Dept. to provide forms on-line, Taxpayer Fraud Prevention Act, Sec. 40-18-73 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax withholding exemption repealed, Revenue Dept. to provide forms on-line, Taxpayer Fraud Prevention Act, Sec. 40-18-73 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-08-10 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-08-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
2015-08-10HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-504.
2015-08-10HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-08-10HouseEnrolled
2015-08-10SenateSignature Requested
2015-08-10HousePassed Second House
2015-08-10SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 57
2015-08-10SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-08-07SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-08-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-08-05HouseEngrossed
2015-08-05HouseBracy intended to vote "Abstain"
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 14
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 13
2015-08-05HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 12
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means Education Amendment #2 Offered
2015-08-05HouseWays and Means Education Amendment #1 Offered
2015-08-05HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-08-04HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
2015-08-03HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback