AL HB416 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coffee County, motor vehicle license tags, additional $8 fee, distributed to sheriff and district attorney
Title
Coffee County, motor vehicle license tags, additional $8 fee, distributed to sheriff and district attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 510 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 83 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Pending Senate Local Legislation |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Local Legislation |
2024-04-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 510 |
2024-04-11 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-04-09 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-04-04 | House | Pending House Local Legislation |
2024-04-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Local Legislation |