AL HB405 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to definitions used in state law; to provide legislative findings; to amend Section 1-1-1, Code of Alabama 1975, to define terms and delete obsolete or unnecessary definitions; to require vital statistics records to identify each individual as male or female at birth; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Title
Relating to definitions used in state law; to provide legislative findings; to amend Section 1-1-1, Code of Alabama 1975, to define terms and delete obsolete or unnecessary definitions; to require vital statistics records to identify each individual as male or female at birth; and to make nonsubstantive, technical revisions to update the existing code language to current style.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | House | Indefinitely Postpone |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Health |
2023-05-24 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Health JCQPYY-1 |
2023-05-17 | House | Carry Over by House Health |
2023-04-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Health |
2023-04-27 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |