AL HB405 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance, residential roofing contract cancellation prior to midnight of 5th business day, exceptions
Title
Insurance, residential roofing contract cancellation prior to midnight of 5th business day, exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Ball [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-519. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1589 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education | |
2012-05-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-02 | Engrossed | |
2012-05-02 | Beech intended to vote "Yea" | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1141 | |
2012-05-02 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1140 | |
2012-05-02 | Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2012-05-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |