AL HB394 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure, asset forfeiture for drug offenses provided, Alabama Criminal Forfeiture Process Act, Secs. 20-2-93 repealed
Title
Criminal procedure, asset forfeiture for drug offenses provided, Alabama Criminal Forfeiture Process Act, Secs. 20-2-93 repealed
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-11 | House | Rereferred from Judy to SG |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB210 (Same As) 2021-05-17 - Assigned Act No. 2021-497 on 05/25/2021.