AL HB393 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Physical Therapy, Board of, members further provided for, Sec. 34-24-192 am'd.; Act 2009-27, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Title
Physical Therapy, Board of, members further provided for, Sec. 34-24-192 am'd.; Act 2009-27, 2009 Reg. Sess. am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. H Gipson [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 3:20 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-703 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1199 | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 572 | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions |