AL HB390 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on April 29, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
ClasTran, Birmingham Regional Paratransit Consortium, exempt from all sales and use taxes
Title
ClasTran, Birmingham Regional Paratransit Consortium, exempt from all sales and use taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1234 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Waggoner Substitute Roll Call 1233 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1229 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1228 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1066 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 692 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 691 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Waggoner Substitute Roll Call 1233 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1229 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1228 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1066 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 692 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - HBIR: Faulkner motion to Adopt Roll Call 691 (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on April 29, 2021. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Third Reading Received |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-374. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-04-29 | House | Enrolled |
2021-04-29 | House | Faulkner motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1066 |
2021-04-29 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1234 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Waggoner Substitute adopted Roll Call 1233 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Waggoner Substitute offered |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reed motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1229 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 692 |
2021-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-24 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |