AL HB384 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alzheimer's Disease Task Force, established to assess the current and future impact of Alzheimer's disease in Alabama, members, duties, Mental Health Department to provide administrative support, report of findings to Governor and Legislature, termination date (2010-20980)
Title
Alzheimer's Disease Task Force, established to assess the current and future impact of Alzheimer's disease in Alabama, members, duties, Mental Health Department to provide administrative support, report of findings to Governor and Legislature, termination date (2010-20980)
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-22 - House - Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-22 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2010-04-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-22 | Delivered to Governor at 4:25 p.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Assigned Act No. 2010-702 on 04/29/2010. | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-22 | Hall motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1144 | |
2010-04-22 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1220 | |
2010-04-22 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1219 | |
2010-04-22 | Education first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-22 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Reported from Education as Favorable with 1 substitute | |
2010-04-14 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education | |
2010-04-14 | Cosponsors Added | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1048 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Placed on the Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |