AL HB383 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Decedents' estates, will contests, probate courts jurisdiction, removed to circuit courts
Title
Decedents' estates, will contests, probate courts jurisdiction, removed to circuit courts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 780 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 779 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Wadsworth motion to Adopt Roll Call 778 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 779 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - HBIR: Wadsworth motion to Adopt Roll Call 778 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-30 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-30 | House | Mooney intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 780 |
2022-03-30 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 779 |
2022-03-30 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-22 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB256 (Same As) 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-427.