AL SB256 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-427.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2022-427.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wills and estates, will contests, probate courts jurisdiction, removed to circuit courts under certain conditions
Title
Wills and estates, will contests, probate courts jurisdiction, removed to circuit courts under certain conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 992 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 755 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 754 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 753 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 755 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 754 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Senate - SBIR: Barfoot motion to Adopt Roll Call 753 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Assigned Act No. 2022-427. |
2022-04-07 | House | Signature Requested |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Passed Second House |
2022-04-07 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 992 |
2022-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 755 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Barfoot motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 754 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB383 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary