AL HB371 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-20 - Died in Senate Basket.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid, Medicaid copayments, Medicaid Agency waiver request to increase copayments for health care services
Title
Medicaid, Medicaid copayments, Medicaid Agency waiver request to increase copayments for health care services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Died in Senate Basket. |
2013-04-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 730 |
2013-04-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |