AL HB37 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Assigned Act No. 2015-553.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, autocycles defined, vehicle with three wheels, driver required to have regular driver's license, otherwise treated as motorcycle

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, autocycles defined, vehicle with three wheels, driver required to have regular driver's license, otherwise treated as motorcycle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 91 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 6 N: 86 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2015-09-14 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-553.
2015-09-16HouseForwarded to Governor on September 16, 2015 at 2:15 p.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16HouseEnrolled
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-16HousePassed Second House
2015-09-16SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 58
2015-09-16SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-15SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-14SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-14HouseEngrossed
2015-09-14HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40
2015-09-14HouseMotion to Adopt lost Roll Call 39
2015-09-14HousePettus Amendment Offered
2015-09-14HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 38
2015-09-14HouseMcCutcheon first Substitute Offered
2015-09-14HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback