AL HB363 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Methamphetamines, further regulation of the sale of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine products, licensed pharmacies solely authorized to sell, criminal penalties enhanced, membership of Alabama Drug Abuse Task Force revised, Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center to create an electronic drug offender tracking system, Secs. 13A-12-260, 20-2-190 am'd; Sec. 20-2-190.2 added

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Methamphetamines, further regulation of the sale of ephedrine and pseudoephedrine products, licensed pharmacies solely authorized to sell, criminal penalties enhanced, membership of Alabama Drug Abuse Task Force revised, Alabama Criminal Justice Information Center to create an electronic drug offender tracking system, Secs. 13A-12-260, 20-2-190 am'd; Sec. 20-2-190.2 added

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-20 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-20 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Table (Y: 20 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 56) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Galliher motion to Table (Y: 66 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-19 Forwarded to Governor on April 19, 2012 at 3:30 p. m. on April 19, 2012.
2012-04-19 Assigned Act No. 2012-237 on 04/24/2012.
2012-04-19 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-04-19 Signature Requested
2012-04-19 Enrolled
2012-04-19 Passed Second House
2012-04-19 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 694
2012-04-19 Holtzclaw motion to Table adopted Roll Call 693
2012-04-19 Bedford first Substitute Offered
2012-04-19 Third Reading Passed
2012-04-05 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-03-22 Rereferred to Committee on Health.
2012-03-20 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2012-03-15 Engrossed
2012-03-15 Cosponsors Added
2012-03-15 Dissent Filed
2012-03-15 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 373
2012-03-15 Galliher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 372
2012-03-15 Fincher Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 371
2012-03-15 HLTH 6th Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 370
2012-03-15 HLTH 5th Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 369
2012-03-15 HLTH 4th Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 368
2012-03-15 HLTH 3rd Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 367
2012-03-15 HLTH 2nd Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 366
2012-03-15 HLTH 1st Amendment Offered
2012-03-15 Third Reading Passed
2012-03-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 6 amendments
2012-02-21 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB363
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB363-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB363-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB363-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431354&VOTE=366&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431355&VOTE=367&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431371&VOTE=368&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431372&VOTE=369&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431375&VOTE=370&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431385&VOTE=371&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431390&VOTE=372&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431419&VOTE=373&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=431423&VOTE=374&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=439684&VOTE=693&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=439685&VOTE=694&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback