AL HB348 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Forwarded to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Drug courts, presiding judge of judicial circuit with consent of district attorney authorized to establish, drug offenders, screening, treatment, support services, and drug testing, referrals to certain programs for treatment, Administrative Office of Courts required to assist in planning, developing, and implementing of drug courts, Drug Offender Accountability Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug courts, presiding judge of judicial circuit with consent of district attorney authorized to establish, drug offenders, screening, treatment, support services, and drug testing, referrals to certain programs for treatment, Administrative Office of Courts required to assist in planning, developing, and implementing of drug courts, Drug Offender Accountability Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-22 - House - Scott motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-04-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Forwarded to Governor at 11:00 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-754 on 04/30/2010.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-22 Scott motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1127
2010-04-22 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1157
2010-04-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1156
2010-04-21 Holley Amendment Offered
2010-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-14 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-08 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2010-04-01 Engrossed
2010-04-01 Cosponsors Added
2010-04-01 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 793
2010-04-01 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 792
2010-04-01 Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered
2010-04-01 Third Reading Passed
2010-03-25 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-01-19 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB348
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB348-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB348-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2010RS/PrintFiles/HB348-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=383403&VOTE=792&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=383404&VOTE=793&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=383405&VOTE=794&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=390945&VOTE=1156&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=390946&VOTE=1157&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=391434&VOTE=1127&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1051&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback