AL HB319 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Forwarded to Executive Department
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pain Management Act, physicians, requirement for physicians to have criminal background check deleted under certain conditions, Act 2013-257, 2013 Reg. Sess., am'd.; Sec. 34-24-604 am'd.
Title
Pain Management Act, physicians, requirement for physicians to have criminal background check deleted under certain conditions, Act 2013-257, 2013 Reg. Sess., am'd.; Sec. 34-24-604 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. April Weaver [R] | Rep. Ed Henry [R] | Sen. Jim McClendon [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | Forwarded to Executive Department |
2014-04-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-349. |
2014-04-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-03 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-03 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1246 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Health |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 310 |
2014-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-21 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |