AL HB267 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriations, school systems, colleges and universities and other entities, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology
Title
Appropriations, school systems, colleges and universities and other entities, supplemental appropriations for fiscal year ending September 30, 2022, from the Education Trust Fund Advancement and Technology
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 927 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 876 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 875 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 874 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 484 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 483 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 482 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 876 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 875 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - SBIR: Orr motion to Adopt Roll Call 874 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 484 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 483 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 482 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:53 p.m. on April 6, 2022. |
2022-04-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-394. |
2022-04-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-06 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2022-04-06 | House | Garrett motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 927 |
2022-04-06 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 876 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 875 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Orr Amendment Offered |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-03-08 | House | Engrossed |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 484 |
2022-03-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 483 |
2022-03-08 | House | Ways and Means Education first Substitute Offered |
2022-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |