AL HB260 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and offenses, to further provide for the crime of criminal homicide, Sec. 13A-6-5 added.
Title
Crimes and offenses, to further provide for the crime of criminal homicide, Sec. 13A-6-5 added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 401 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 400 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - HBIR: Simpson motion to Adopt Roll Call 400 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 24 Favorable from Judiciary |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2022-03-01 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 401 |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB286 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary