AL HB258 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-26 - Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education
Pending: Senate Finance and Taxation Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to exempt High Socks for Hope, Inc., from payment of state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes.
Title
Relating to state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes; to amend Section 40-23-5, Code of Alabama 1975, to exempt High Socks for Hope, Inc., from payment of state, county, and municipal sales and use taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle South [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-26 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |