AL HB258 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
Pending: Senate Local Legislation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Montgomery Co., county commission, salary increase
Title
Montgomery Co., county commission, salary increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 506 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 77 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 505 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-09 - House - HBIR: Morris motion to Adopt Roll Call 505 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 43 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2022-03-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 506 |
2022-03-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-08 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Montgomery County Legislation |
Same As/Similar To
SB176 (Same As) 2022-02-02 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation