AL HB226 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m. on March 11, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m. on March 11, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home Medical Equipment Board, Home Medical Equipment Services Providers Board, renamed, removal of board members, employment of administrator, practicing without a license, penalties, renewal of lapsed license, fees, grounds for revoking, denying, or suspending provided, Sec. 34-14C-1, 34-14C-2, 34-14C-3, 34-14C-4, 34-14C-4.1, 34-14C-5, 34-14C-6, 34-14C-7, 34-14C-8 am'd.
Title
Home Medical Equipment Board, Home Medical Equipment Services Providers Board, renamed, removal of board members, employment of administrator, practicing without a license, penalties, renewal of lapsed license, fees, grounds for revoking, denying, or suspending provided, Sec. 34-14C-1, 34-14C-2, 34-14C-3, 34-14C-4, 34-14C-4.1, 34-14C-5, 34-14C-6, 34-14C-7, 34-14C-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Forwarded to Governor on March 11, 2014 at 2:18 p.m. on March 11, 2014. |
2014-03-11 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-172. |
2014-03-11 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-11 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-11 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 744 |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed |
2014-02-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 178 |
2014-02-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 177 |
2014-02-06 | House | Johnson (R) Amendment Offered |
2014-02-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 176 |
2014-02-06 | House | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered |
2014-02-06 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |