AL HB225 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Affairs Dept., purchasing and sale of certain promotional items authorized, Secs. 31-5-4, 31-5-6, 31-5-9, 31-5-14 am'd.
Title
Veterans Affairs Dept., purchasing and sale of certain promotional items authorized, Secs. 31-5-4, 31-5-6, 31-5-9, 31-5-14 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 472 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Drake motion to Adopt Roll Call 471 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - HBIR: Drake motion to Adopt Roll Call 471 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Drake motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-01 | House | Drake motion to SB123 Substitute for HB225 adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-01 | House | Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed |
2021-03-16 | House | Drake motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | Rowe motion to withdraw adopted Voice Vote |
2021-03-16 | House | Rowe Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 472 |
2021-03-16 | House | Drake Amendment Offered |
2021-03-16 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-02-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
SB123 (Same As) 2021-04-07 - Assigned Act No. 2021-239.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
31 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |