AL HB220 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-17 - Forwarded to Governor at 9:37 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Education Dept., state property, Dept. of Edu., has authority to manange the construction and renovation of property that is part of a state educational institution, Secs. 16-1-2.2, 41-4-353, 41-4-400 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education Dept., state property, Dept. of Edu., has authority to manange the construction and renovation of property that is part of a state educational institution, Secs. 16-1-2.2, 41-4-353, 41-4-400 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-17 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt Executive Amendment Roll Call 1453 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1203 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - Ledbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt Roll Call 1109 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 1263 (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Scofield motion to Adopt Roll Call 1262 (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 1261 (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - SBIR: Singleton motion to Adopt Roll Call 1260 (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 201 (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 200 (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Ledbetter motion to Adopt Roll Call 199 (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-17HouseForwarded to Governor at 9:37 p.m. on May 17, 2021.
2021-05-17HouseAssigned Act No. 2021-476.
2021-05-17HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-05-17SenateSignature Requested
2021-05-17HouseEnrolled
2021-05-17HouseSecond House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2021-05-17SenateChesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt Executive Amendment adopted Roll Call 1453
2021-05-17SenateHouse of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2021-05-17HouseSorrell and McCampbell intended to vote "Yea"
2021-05-17HouseLedbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1203
2021-05-17HouseExecutive Amendment Offered
2021-05-17HouseForwarded to Governor
2021-05-04HouseClerk of the House Certification
2021-05-04SenateSignature Requested
2021-05-04SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2021-04-29HouseEnrolled
2021-04-29HouseLovvorn intended to vote "Nay"
2021-04-29HouseLedbetter motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1109
2021-04-29HouseConcurrence Requested
2021-04-29SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1263
2021-04-29SenateScofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1262
2021-04-29SenateScofield Amendment Offered
2021-04-29SenateChesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1261
2021-04-29SenateGovernmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
2021-04-29SenateThird Reading Passed
2021-04-06SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2021-03-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2021-02-25HouseEngrossed
2021-02-25HouseClarke intended to vote "Yea"
2021-02-25HouseCosponsors Added
2021-02-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 201
2021-02-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 200
2021-02-25HouseLedbetter Amendment Offered
2021-02-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2021-02-10HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2021-02-09HouseRereferred from W&ME to EP
2021-02-04HouseRereferred from SG to W&ME
2021-02-02HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government

Same As/Similar To

SB194 (Same As) 2021-02-04 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1612.2Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414353Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414400Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB220&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB220-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB220-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/HB220-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/210537-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212716-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/212806-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/PrintFiles/214315-1.pdf
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41539.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41702.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-41884.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42567.htm
Supplementhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2021RS/FiscalNotes/FN-42609.htm
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=647679&VOTE=202&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=647612&VOTE=199&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB220&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=647677&VOTE=200&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=647678&VOTE=201&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662508&VOTE=1260&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB220&SESS=1077
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662510&VOTE=1261&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662512&VOTE=1262&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662513&VOTE=1263&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=662815&VOTE=1109&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=665383&VOTE=1203&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=665458&VOTE=1453&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1077&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments 750

feedback