AL HB190 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Healthcare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Healthcare
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency medical services, declared to be for a public purpose
Title
Emergency medical services, declared to be for a public purpose
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Oliver [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 72 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 71 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 70 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 71 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - HBIR: Oliver motion to Adopt Roll Call 70 (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Healthcare |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Healthcare |
2022-02-08 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 72 |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 71 |
2022-02-08 | House | Oliver Amendment Offered |
2022-02-08 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-01 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health |
Same As/Similar To
SB183 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Assigned Act No. 2022-106.