AL HB182 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property; provides the owner of a dwelling with a method to request the removal of an unauthorized individual
Title
Property; provides the owner of a dwelling with a method to request the removal of an unauthorized individual
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 757 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt - Roll Call 756 DRQ8NTH-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 401 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 400 TENZ595-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Elliott motion to Adopt - Roll Call 756 DRQ8NTH-1 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 401 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Adopt - Roll Call 400 TENZ595-1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 757 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Elliott motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 756 DRQ8NTH-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Elliott 1st Amendment Offered DRQ8NTH-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Pending Senate County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on County and Municipal Government |
2024-04-04 | House | Engrossed |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 401 |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 400 TENZ595-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute Offered TENZ595-1 |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-03-20 | House | Judiciary 1st Substitute TENZ595-1 |
2024-02-15 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-15 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |