AL HB175 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to income taxes; to provide a one-time refundable income tax credit to qualified taxpayers to partially offset the amount of sales taxes paid on groceries throughout the tax year; to create the Refundable Tax Credit Fund in the State Treasury; to provide that refundable credits would not be taxable for Alabama income tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Relating to income taxes; to provide a one-time refundable income tax credit to qualified taxpayers to partially offset the amount of sales taxes paid on groceries throughout the tax year; to create the Refundable Tax Credit Fund in the State Treasury; to provide that refundable credits would not be taxable for Alabama income tax purposes; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-01 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Adopt YV79N6-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt KEM45U-1 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt SO6C88-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Adopt YV79N6-1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt KEM45U-1 (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Adopt SO6C88-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | House | Enacted |
2023-06-01 | House | Enrolled |
2023-06-01 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Adopt YV79N6-1 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-31 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Finance and Taxation Education YV79N6-1 |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Finance and Taxation Education |
2023-05-26 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-25 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt KEM45U-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | Adopt SO6C88-1 |
2023-05-25 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-05-24 | House | Reported Favorably from House Ways and Means Education |
2023-05-24 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Ways and Means Education SO6C88-1 |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Ways and Means Education |
2023-03-21 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |