AL HB128 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - Currently Indefinitely Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipal historic preservation commissions; municipalities prohibited from designating place of worship as historic property; places of worship authorized to agree to historic designation; retroactive application, provided for
Title
Municipal historic preservation commissions; municipalities prohibited from designating place of worship as historic property; places of worship authorized to agree to historic designation; retroactive application, provided for
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Gidley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | House | Currently Indefinitely Postponed |
2024-04-25 | House | Carried Over to the Call of the Chair |
2024-02-14 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Urban and Rural Development |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Urban and Rural Development |