AL HB122 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to health care; to prohibit discrimination against an individual with a disability in receiving an anatomical gift or organ transplant based on his or her disability; to require health care providers and organ transplant centers to provide reasonable accommodations to individuals with a disability in medical need of an anatomical gift or organ transplant; and to provide disabled individuals the right to equitable relief.
Title
Relating to health care; to prohibit discrimination against an individual with a disability in receiving an anatomical gift or organ transplant based on his or her disability; to require health care providers and organ transplant centers to provide reasonable accommodations to individuals with a disability in medical need of an anatomical gift or organ transplant; and to provide disabled individuals the right to equitable relief.
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - Concur In and Adopt (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt 6FYU1Z-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt U7LCGX-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Adopt 6FYU1Z-1 (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-09 - House - Adopt U7LCGX-1 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled |
2023-05-26 | House | Concur In and Adopt |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read A Third Time And Passed As Amended |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Adopt 6FYU1Z-1 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Healthcare |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Amendment/Substitute by Senate Healthcare 6FYU1Z-1 |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Healthcare |
2023-05-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-05-09 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-05-09 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended |
2023-05-09 | House | Adopt U7LCGX-1 |
2023-05-09 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-04-19 | House | Reported Favorably from House Health |
2023-03-21 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Health |
2023-03-21 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |