AL HB12 | 2012 | 1st Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-24 - Delivered to Secretary of State at 1:50 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Bonds, general obligation bonds issued by state, aggregate principal amount limitations specified, not subject to certain other const. limitations, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds, general obligation bonds issued by state, aggregate principal amount limitations specified, not subject to certain other const. limitations, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-11-07 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - Senate - Rules Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-11-07 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 101 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-24 Delivered to Secretary of State at 1:50 a. m. on May 24, 2012.
2012-05-24 Assigned Act No. 2012-567.
2012-05-24 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-24 Signature Requested
2012-05-24 Enrolled
2012-05-24 Passed Second House
2012-05-24 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
2012-05-24 Rules Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 26
2012-05-24 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-23 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-22 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2012-05-21 Engrossed
2012-05-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17
2012-05-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 16
2012-05-21 Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
2012-05-21 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-18 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2012-05-17 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback