AL HB114 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:06 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 5:06 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Guardianships and conservatorships, adults, jurisdiction, transfer of proceedings to another state, enforcement of guardianship and protective orders from other states, Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act, Secs. 26-2B-101 to 26-2B-106, 26-2B-201 to 26-2B-210, 26-2B-301, 26-2B-302, 26-2B-401 to 26-2B-403, 26-2B-501 to 26-2B-503 added; Secs. 26-2A-31, 26-2A-109, 26-2A-131 am'd.
Title
Guardianships and conservatorships, adults, jurisdiction, transfer of proceedings to another state, enforcement of guardianship and protective orders from other states, Uniform Adult Guardianship and Protective Proceedings Jurisdiction Act, Secs. 26-2B-101 to 26-2B-106, 26-2B-201 to 26-2B-210, 26-2B-301, 26-2B-302, 26-2B-401 to 26-2B-403, 26-2B-501 to 26-2B-503 added; Secs. 26-2A-31, 26-2A-109, 26-2A-131 am'd.
Sponsors
Sen. Tammy Irons [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-01-26 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 5:06 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-500. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1112 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-25 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-02-02 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-26 | Engrossed | |
2010-01-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 107 | |
2010-01-26 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 106 | |
2010-01-26 | Judiciary first Substitute Offered | |
2010-01-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |