AL HB112 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hearing Instrument Dealers, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Title
Hearing Instrument Dealers, Board of, Sunset Law review, continued until October 1, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:35 p.m. on February 28, 2017. |
2017-02-28 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-52. |
2017-02-28 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-02-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 168 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Fiscal Responsibility and Economic Development |
2017-02-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39 |
2017-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |