AK SR6 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on November 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-11-18 - PERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Urging the Alaska division of motor vehicles to advocate for discontinued use of social security numbers as a means of identity verification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Id Act: Social Security Numbers

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-18SenatePERMANENTLY FILED 11/13 SENATE RESOLVE 6
2017-06-09SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-06-09Senate2:10 PM 6/7/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-15SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-05-15SenateBEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
2017-05-12SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback