AK SJR6 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Const. Am: Perm Fund & Pfds
Title
Const. Am: Perm Fund & Pfds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | House | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-10-04 | Senate | FOURTH SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-08-16 | House | THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-08-16 | Senate | THIRD SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-05-14 | House | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FIRST SPECIAL SESSION BILL |
2021-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-14 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2021-05-14 | Senate | AM: KIEHL |
2021-05-14 | Senate | DP: HOLLAND, MYERS, HUGHES, SHOWER |
2021-05-14 | Senate | JUD RPT CS 4DP 1AM NEW TITLE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | JUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23 |
2021-02-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2021-02-24 | Senate | AM: HOLLAND, KAWASAKI |
2021-02-24 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO |
2021-02-24 | Senate | DP: SHOWER |
2021-02-24 | Senate | STA RPT 1DP 1NR 2AM |
2021-01-22 | Senate | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-01-22 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2021-01-22 | Senate | STA, JUD, FIN |
2021-01-22 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=SJR6 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SJR006A.PDF |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/SJR006B.PDF |