AK SJR22 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-02 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Opposing the warrantless collection of telephone call data by the National Security Agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oppose Warrantless Data Collection

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Shall the Senate Concur in the House Amendment to SJR 22 am? (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-07-02SenateDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/25/14
2014-07-02Senate9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2014-04-19SenateCONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
2014-04-19SenateCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2014-04-18HouseVERSION: HCS SJR 22(JUD)
2014-04-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
2014-04-18HouseGUTTENBERG, LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON, SEATON, PRUITT
2014-04-18HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, HUGHES, MILLETT, COSTELLO, FEIGE, ISAACSON,
2014-04-18HousePASSED Y38 E1 A1
2014-04-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HCS SJR 22(JUD)
2014-04-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-18HouseJUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-04-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-04-18HouseRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014
2014-04-13HouseFN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
2014-04-13HouseDP: LEDOUX, PRUITT, GRUENBERG, LYNN, KELLER
2014-04-13HouseJUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP
2014-04-01HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK, KELLER
2014-04-01HouseJUD
2014-04-01HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2014-03-31SenateVERSION: SJR 22 AM
2014-03-31SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2014-03-31SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2014-03-31SenateCOSPONSOR(S): HUGGINS
2014-03-31SenateCOSPONSOR(S): DYSON, FRENCH, STEVENS, KELLY, MEYER, EGAN
2014-03-31SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SJR 22 AM
2014-03-31SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-31SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2014-03-31SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2014-03-31SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 3/31/2014
2014-03-10SenateFN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
2014-03-10SenateDP: COGHILL, OLSON, DYSON
2014-03-10SenateJUD RPT 3DP
2014-02-14SenateCOSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, BISHOP, GARDNER, DUNLEAVY, MICCICHE, WIELECHOWSKI, ELLIS
2014-02-14SenateJUD
2014-02-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback