AK SJR13 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
Pending: House Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Hearing: May 13 @ 8:00 am in Barnes 124
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Improve Broadband Internet Access

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Improve Broadband Internet Access

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04HouseREFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS
2021-05-04HouseCRA
2021-05-04HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2021-05-03SenateVERSION: CSSJR 13(CRA)
2021-05-03SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2021-05-03SenatePASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
2021-05-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSJR 13(CRA)
2021-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/3 CALENDAR
2021-04-30SenateCRA CS ADOPTED UC
2021-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2021-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2021
2021-04-23SenateL&C REFERRAL WAIVED
2021-04-23SenateFN1: ZERO(S.CRA)
2021-04-23SenateNR: MYERS
2021-04-23SenateDP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON
2021-04-23SenateCRA RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2021-04-14SenateCRA, L&C
2021-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback