AK SCR9 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-26 - PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 71, requiring the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development to file an annual report to the legislature regarding statewide and regional economic development projects and regional development organizations; and extending the termination date of the Alaska regional economic assistance program.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 71
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-26 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 3/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 27 |
2014-03-03 | Senate | 12:27 PM 3/3 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-02-24 | House | VERSION: SCR 9 |
2014-02-24 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-02-24 | House | PASSED Y35 E4 V1 |
2014-02-24 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2013-04-13 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2013-04-12 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 9 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2013-04-12 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2013-04-12 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2013-04-12 | Senate | TAKEN UP |
2013-04-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |