AK SCR33 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 15 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspending Rules 24(c), 35, 41(b), and 42(e), Uniform Rules of the Alaska State Legislature, concerning House Bill No. 246, naming certain bridges and airports.
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 246
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | 1:50 PM 5/31/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-05-21 | LEGIS RESOLVE NO. 47 | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCR 33 | |
2012-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y39 V1 | |
2012-04-15 | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS | |
2012-04-15 | READ THE FIRST TIME | |
2012-04-15 | VERSION: SCR 33 | |
2012-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2012-04-15 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2012-04-15 | TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE | |
2012-04-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |