AK SCR19 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 25
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 168
Title
Suspend Uniform Rules For Hb 168
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Special Order of Business (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | Senate | PERMANENTLY FILED 7/28 LEGIS RESOLVE 25 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | 10:30 A.M. 7/25/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-10-05 | Senate | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2022-05-18 | House | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-05-18 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | SPECIAL ORDER OF BUSINESS |
2022-05-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCR 19 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N1 E1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE |
2022-05-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK |
Subjects
Attorney General
Families
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Internet
Public Assistance
State Aid
Uniform Rules
Families
Health & Social Services
Insurance
Internet
Public Assistance
State Aid
Uniform Rules