AK SB89 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE
Pending: House Labor & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to tobacco, tobacco products, electronic smoking products, nicotine, and products containing nicotine; raising the minimum age to purchase, exchange, or possess tobacco, a product containing nicotine, or an electronic smoking product; relating to the tobacco use education and cessation fund; relating to the taxation of electronic smoking products and vapor products; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Age For Tobacco/nicotine/e-cig; Tax E-cig
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Stevens [R] | Sen. Catherine Giessel [R] | Sen. Elvi Gray-Jackson [D] | Sen. Jesse Kiehl [D] |
Sen. Loki Tobin [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | House | REFERRED TO LABOR & COMMERCE |
2024-01-16 | House | L&C, FIN |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2023-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 89(FIN) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2023-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2023-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/16 CAL |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2023-05-15 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC |
2023-05-15 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(FIN) |
2023-05-14 | Senate | NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL |
2023-05-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2023-05-13 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2023-05-13 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/23 |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN9: ZERO(AJS) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN8: (REV) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(LAW) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-05-13 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2023-05-13 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, MERRICK |
2023-05-13 | Senate | DP: OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP |
2023-05-13 | Senate | FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN7: ZERO(LAW) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN6: ZERO(DPS) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN5: (REV) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(DOH) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON |
2023-04-24 | Senate | L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE |
2023-03-01 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GRAY-JACKSON, KIEHL, TOBIN |
2023-03-01 | Senate | L&C, FIN |
2023-03-01 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Age Of Persons
Agency
Business
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Funds
Licensing
Marijuana
Minors
Sales
Taxation
Tobacco
Agency
Business
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Education
Funds
Licensing
Marijuana
Minors
Sales
Taxation
Tobacco