AK SB88 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY, GROH
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement Systems; Defined Benefit Opt.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 2 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2024-01-31 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-04-10HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY, GROH
2024-04-09HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG, GALVIN, HIMSCHOOT
2024-04-05HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON
2024-04-03HouseCROSS SPONSOR(S): CARRICK, SCHRAGE
2024-02-05HouseREFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
2024-02-05HouseSTA, L&C, FIN
2024-02-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2024-02-02SenateVERSION: CSSB 88(FIN)
2024-02-02SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2024-02-02SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N0 E2
2024-02-02SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y11 N7 E2
2024-02-02SenateRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2024-01-31SenateHOFFMAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2024-01-31SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y17 N0 E3
2024-01-31SenatePASSED Y12 N5 E3
2024-01-31SenateAM NO 2 FAILED Y2 N15 E3
2024-01-31SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N15 E3
2024-01-31SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS UC
2024-01-31SenateBEFORE THE SENATE
2024-01-30SenateNOT TAKEN UP 1/30 - ON 1/31 CAL
2024-01-29SenateHELD IN THIRD READING TO 1/31 CAL
2024-01-29SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 88(FIN)
2024-01-26SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 1/29 CAL
2024-01-26SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2024-01-26SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-01-26SenateFN3: (S.FIN/VARIOUS)
2024-01-26SenateFN2: (ADM)
2024-01-26SenateDNP: WILSON
2024-01-26SenateNR: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, MERRICK
2024-01-26SenateDP: OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
2024-01-26SenateFIN RPT CS 3DP 1DNP 3NR SAME TITLE
2024-01-26SenateRULES TO CALENDAR PENDING FIN RPT
2023-05-16SenateCOSPONSOR(S): OLSON
2023-05-01SenateFN1: (ADM)
2023-05-01SenateNR: MERRICK
2023-05-01SenateDP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, BISHOP
2023-05-01SenateL&C RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
2023-03-01SenateCOSPONSOR(S): KIEHL, KAWASAKI, TOBIN, WIELECHOWSKI, GRAY-JACKSON, DUNBAR, CLAMAN
2023-03-01SenateL&C, FIN
2023-03-01SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback