AK SB80 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN5: (EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-05 - FN5: (EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to mental health education; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Public Schools: Mental Health Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 17 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 to Amendment No. 2 (Y: 18 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | FN5: (EED) |
2022-10-05 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 282 |
2022-10-05 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-10-05 | Senate | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22 |
2022-05-18 | House | NOT TAKEN UP - ADJOURNED SINE DIE |
2022-05-18 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2022-05-17 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 5/18 CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 4 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 3 ADOPTED Y21 N18 E1 |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y20 N18 E2 |
2022-05-17 | House | CALL FOR THE QUESTION WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-17 | House | AM 3 TO AM 2 FAILED Y17 N20 E3 |
2022-05-17 | House | AM 2 TO AM 2 FAILED Y18 N18 E3 A1 |
2022-05-17 | House | AM 1 TO AM 2 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-17 | House | CALL FOR THE QUESTION WITHDRAWN |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED |
2022-05-17 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | FIN HCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | FN5: (EED) |
2022-04-26 | House | AM: JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK |
2022-04-26 | House | NR: LEBON |
2022-04-26 | House | DNP: CARPENTER, THOMPSON |
2022-04-26 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, FOSTER |
2022-04-26 | House | FIN RPT HCS(FIN) TECH TITLE 5DP 2DNP 1NR 3AM |
2022-04-06 | House | HSS AND EDC REFERRALS REMOVED |
2022-04-05 | House | HSS, EDC, FIN |
2022-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-04 | Senate | VERSION: CSSB 80(HSS) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | PASSED Y13 N1 E4 A2 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 4/4 CAL |
2022-03-28 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/30 CAL |
2022-03-28 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 80(HSS) |
2022-03-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/28 CAL |
2022-03-25 | Senate | HSS CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-25 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-25 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/25/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | FN4: (EED) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, VON IMHOF |
2022-03-15 | Senate | FIN RPT CS(HSS) 5DP SAME TITLE |
2021-04-21 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | FN3: (EED) |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DNP: HUGHES |
2021-04-21 | Senate | DP: BEGICH |
2021-04-21 | Senate | NR: WILSON, COSTELLO, REINBOLD |
2021-04-21 | Senate | HSS RPT CS 1DP 1DNP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2021-04-07 | Senate | COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH |
2021-03-24 | Senate | FN2: (EED) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV/COMBINED) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | DP: BEGICH |
2021-03-24 | Senate | NR: HOLLAND, HUGHES |
2021-03-24 | Senate | EDC RPT CS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE |
2021-02-12 | Senate | EDC, HSS, FIN |
2021-02-12 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |