AK SB78 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to liability of certain limited liability organizations holding liquor licenses; and relating to accidents involving the vehicle of a person under the influence of alcoholic beverages.
Title
Liability Related To Alcohol
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/11 | |
2011-06-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 15 SLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 12:10 PM 5/23/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-15 | VERSION: CSSB 78(JUD) | |
2011-04-15 | RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT | |
2011-04-15 | PASSED Y40 | |
2011-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 78(JUD) | |
2011-04-15 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-15 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-15 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2011-04-14 | DP: LYNN, GRUENBERG, KELLER, THOMPSON, HOLMES, PRUITT, GATTO | |
2011-04-14 | JUD RPT 7DP | |
2011-04-09 | JUD | |
2011-04-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-08 | VERSION: CSSB 78(JUD) | |
2011-04-08 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) | |
2011-04-08 | PASSED Y19 N- A1 | |
2011-04-08 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 78(JUD) | |
2011-04-08 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-08 | JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-08 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-08 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2011-04-06 | NR: COGHILL | |
2011-04-06 | DP: FRENCH, WIELECHOWSKI, PASKVAN, MCGUIRE | |
2011-04-06 | JUD RPT CS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE | |
2011-03-30 | FN1: ZERO(DPS) | |
2011-03-30 | DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2011-03-30 | L&C RPT 5DP | |
2011-02-04 | L&C, JUD | |
2011-02-04 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |