AK SB76 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the Workers' Compensation Appeals Commission; relating to decisions and orders of the Workers' Compensation Appeals Commission; relating to superior court jurisdiction over appeals from Alaska Workers' Compensation Board decisions; repealing Rules 201.1, 401.1, and 501.1, Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure, and amending Rules 202(a), 204(a) - (c), 210(e), 601(b), 602(c) and (h), and 603(a), Alaska Rules of Appellate Procedure; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repeal Workers' Comp Appeals Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2020-02-12SenateFN2: ZERO(AJS)
2020-02-12SenateFN1: (LWF)
2020-02-12SenateDP: BISHOP, STEVENS, REVAK
2020-02-12SenateL&C RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
2020-01-29SenateCOSPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, STEVENS, BEGICH
2019-03-20SenateCOSPONSOR(S): BISHOP
2019-03-06SenateL&C, JUD, FIN
2019-03-06SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback