AK SB75 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 14 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to an audiology and speech-language interstate compact; relating to the practice of audiology and the practice of speech-language pathology; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Aud. & Speech-lang Interstate Compact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Effective Date Clause(s) (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-03SenateMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2024-05-15SenateAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2024-05-14HouseVERSION: CSSB 75(FIN)
2024-05-14HouseRETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2024-05-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2024-05-14HousePASSED Y39 N1
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 75(FIN)
2024-05-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2024-05-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2024-05-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
2024-05-10HouseFN2: ZERO(CED)
2024-05-10HouseNR: JOSEPHSON
2024-05-10HouseFOSTER
2024-05-10HouseDP: STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, COULOMBE, ORTIZ, CRONK, TOMASZEWSKI, D.JOHNSON,
2024-05-10HouseFIN RPT 9DP 1NR
2023-05-12HouseFIN
2023-05-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2023-05-11SenateVERSION: CSSB 75(FIN)
2023-05-11SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H)
2023-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N1 E1
2023-05-11SenatePASSED Y11 N8 E1
2023-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSB 75(FIN)
2023-05-10SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/11 CAL
2023-05-10SenateFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2023-05-10SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2023-05-10SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/23
2023-04-19SenateFN1: (CED)
2023-04-19SenateNR: STEDMAN, OLSON, KIEHL, MERRICK
2023-04-19SenateDP: HOFFMAN
2023-04-19SenateFIN RPT CS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE
2023-03-29SenateFN1: (CED)
2023-03-29SenateNR: MERRICK, BISHOP
2023-03-29SenateDP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, GRAY-JACKSON
2023-03-29SenateL&C RPT 3DP 2NR
2023-02-17SenateL&C, FIN
2023-02-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback