AK SB73 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-20 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the use of headlights when operating a motor vehicle.
Title
Use Of Headlights Required
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-03-20 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD | |
2009-03-20 | FN2: (DOT) | |
2009-03-20 | FN1: ZERO (DPS) | |
2009-03-20 | NR: THERRIAULT, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE | |
2009-03-20 | DP: FRENCH | |
2009-03-20 | JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE | |
2009-03-11 | COSPONSOR(S): PASKVAN | |
2009-03-05 | FN1: ZERO (DPS) | |
2009-03-05 | DP: KOOKESH, DAVIS, MEYER, PASKVAN | |
2009-03-05 | TRA RPT 4DP | |
2009-01-22 | TRA, JUD | |
2009-01-22 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |